**What are Vedic Math Multiplication Tricks?**

Vedic Math multiplication tricks are techniques that you can use to simplify mathematics problems and perform quick calculations. For example, to multiply 23 by 11, you can add 2 and 3 to get 5 and place 5 in the middle of 2 and 3 to get 253.

Vedic Math originated from the Vedas (the oldest scriptures of India), which have been passed down through generations for nearly five millennia. Vedic Mathematics consists of various techniques and principles that make calculations intuitive and straightforward. These methods have gained popularity among students and educators due to their efficiency in solving complex problems quickly and effectively.

In this blog, let us look at some of the Vedic Math multiplication tricks you must definitely know of.

### Top Vedic Math Multiplication Tricks

#### 1. Squaring a number with the unit digit 5

Use this trick to find the square of any number where the last digit (unit digit) is 5.

Let’s take **75²** as an example.

**Step 1:** Take the first digit (7) and multiply it with its successive number, i.e., the next number after 7, which is 8.

**7 x 8 = 56**

**Step 2: **Take the result (56) and add 25 at the end.

**75² = 5625**

**Result: **So, the answer is 5625.

You can do this with a three-digit number, too. Now that you understand the technique, attempt to calculate the squares of 65 and 95.

#### 2. Multiplying any two-digit numbers between 11 and 19

To swiftly multiply any two-digit integer from 11 to 19, use this Vedic trick.

Let’s take the problem: **13 x 15**

**Step 1:** First, arrange both numbers in descending order (15 x 13).

**Step 2:** Add the unit digit (3) from the second number (13) to the first number (15)

**15 + 3 = 18**

**Step 3:** Add a zero at the end, i.e., multiply the result by 10.

**18 x 10 = 180**

**Step 4:** Multiply the unit digits of both numbers.

**5 x 3 = 15**

**Step 5:** Add both the numbers.

**180 + 15 = 195**

**Result: **So, the answer is 195.

#### 3. Multiplying any number by 5

To easily multiply any number by 5, follow these steps.

We are taking these two problems as examples:

**A) Even number: 2464 x 5**

**Step 1: **Divide the number by 2

2464/2 = 1232

**Step 2: **Add a zero at the end.

**Result: **12320

**B) Odd number: 4665 x 5**

**Step 1: **Subtract 1 from the number.

**4665 – 1 = 4664**

**Step 2: **Divide the number by 2.

**4664/2 = 2332**

**Step 3: **Add the number five (5) at the end.

**Result: **23325.

#### 4. Multiplying any two-digit number by 11

Follow these steps to easily multiply any number with 11.

The examples we are taking are as follows:

**A) 32 x 11 **

**Step 1:** Separate the digits.

**3 and 2**

**Step 2:** Add the digits.

**2 + 3 = 5 (The sum is less than 9)**

**Step 3:** Place the sum (5) between the digits (3 and 2).

**Result: **352

**B) 67 x 11**

**Step 1:** Separate the digits.

**6 and 7**

**Step 2:** Add the digits.

**6 + 7 = 13 (The sum is greater than 9)**

**Step 3:** Place the sum (13) between the digits (6 and 7).

**6 13 7**

**Step 4: **Add the first two digits ( 6 and 1).

**7 3 7**

**Result: **737.

#### 5. Multiplying single and double-digit numbers with 9 & 99

A simple method to multiply any integer by 9 is as follows:

Let us take the following examples:

**A) 7 x 9 (Both single digits)**

**Step 1:** Subtract 1 from the number.

**7 – 1= 6**

**Step 2:** Subtract the number you have (7) from 10.

**10 – 7 = 3**

**Step 3: **Place both the answers together in the result.

**Result:** 63

**B) 18 x 99 (Both double digits)**

**Step 1:** Subtract 1 from the number.

**18 – 1= 17**

**Step 2:** Subtract the number you have (18) from 100.

**100 – 18 = 82**

**Step 3: **Place both the answers together in the result.

**Result:** 1782

**C) 34 x 9 (Two-digit multiplicand x single-digit multiplier)**

**Step 1:** Take the first digit (3) from the number (34) and add 1 to it.

**3 + 1 = 4**

**Step 2: **Subtract the result from the main number (34).

**34 – 4 = 30 **

**Step 3:** From the main number (34), take the digit in the unit’s place (4) and subtract it from 10.

**10 – 4 = 6**

**Step 3: **Place both the results together.

**Result:** 306.

**D) 8 x 99 (Single-digit multiplicand x two-digit multiplier)**

**Step 1:** Take the number 8 and subtract 1 from it.

**8 – 1 = 7**

**Step 2: **Subtract the number from 10.

**10 – 8 = 2 **

**Step 3:** Put both results together.

**7 and 2**

**Step 3: **Place the number 9 in between both numbers.

**Result: 792.**

### Final Thoughts

Vedic Mathematics, rooted in the Vedas, offers ancient yet effective techniques for solving math problems quickly and accurately. Known for their simplicity and speed, these methods are popular among students and professionals alike. Whether it’s squaring numbers, multiplying, dividing, or more, Vedic Math provides practical solutions for various mathematical tasks. By mastering vedic math multiplication tricks, individuals can save time and effort in calculations and gain confidence in their mathematical abilities. Due to technological progress, the opportunity to learn mathematics online through various resources has become increasingly available.

### Frequently Asked Questions (FAQs)

**Q1. How can Vedic multiplication tricks help me daily? **

**Answer: **Vedic multiplication tricks have many practical applications in our daily lives. They can assist in budget balancing, calculating tips, shopping bargaining, etc. They help save both time and mental effort.

**Q2.** **Are Vedic multiplication formulas complex for non-Vedic mathematicians to learn and understand?**

**Answer: **Vedic multiplication formulas are straightforward and intuitive. Even though they may appear unfamiliar at first, with practice and coaching from books, tutorials, and educational courses, anyone can learn and apply these strategies.

**Q3.** **Are Vedic multiplication formulas more accurate and faster than standard methods of multiplication?**

**Answer: **Vedic multiplication formulas are faster and more accurate than conventional approaches to multiplication. Vedic math uses numerical patterns and symmetries to quickly calculate with fewer steps, thus decreasing mistakes and producing more precise outcomes. With practice, Vedic multiplication becomes quicker and more accurate than its traditional counterpart.

### Recommended Articles

We hope you learn, practice, and apply these amazing Vedic Math multiplication tricks to quicken and improve your Math skills. For similar tricks and tips related articles, check the following links.